## Brackets Ex (90)

Many + lots method (x+3)(x+2) = x(x+2) + 3(x+2)  =  x2 + 2x + 3x + 6   = x2 + 5x + 6

Face method(x+3)(x+2)  =  x2 + 6 +  3x + 2x   =   x2 + 6 +  5x   =   x2 + 5x + 6

Exercises in multiplying pairs of brackets: whichever method you prefer,  your eventual answer should be in the  x2 + 5x + 6  form.

1    (x + 2)(x + 3)              11  (3x + 1)(x + 2)              21  (5x + 2)(5x - 2)

2  (x + 3)(x + 4)                12  (3x + 1)(3x + 1)            22  (3x + 2)(3x - 2)

3  (x + 4)(x + 5)                13 (x + 2)(4x + 3)               23(  7x + 12)(7x - 12)

4  (x + 2)(x + 1)                 14  (x - 2)(x + 3)                24  (5x + 20)(5x - 20)

5  (x + 1)(x + 1)                 15  (x - 2)(x - 3)                 25  (5x + 2)(x - 2)

6  (x + 1)(x + 3)                 16   (x - 2)(x - 3)                26  3(x + 4)(x - 2)

7  (x + 4)(x + 3)                 17  (3x - 2)(x - 3)               27  12(x + 2)(x - 2)

8  (x + 12)(x + 3)               18  (x - 1)(x - 3)                 28  (3x + 4)(5x - 2)

9  (x + 4)(x + 9)                 19  (x + 2)(x - 3)                29  (5x + 21)(5x - 21)

10  (x + 10)(x + 10)           20  (3x + 2)(4x - 3)            30  (px + q)(px - q)

If you let x = 10 for 1 to 10 above, you can check your answers by doing this arithmetic in 31 to 40. For 41 to 60 use the algebra technique to make the arithmetic simpler, for example

103 x 102 = (100 +3)(100 +2)  =  100² + 6 +  300 + 200   = 10000+500+6  = 10506

31    (10 + 2)(10+ 3)            41    (30 + 1)(10 + 2)              51     52 x 51

32    (10 + 3)(10 + 4)           42    (30 + 1)(30 + 1)              52     52 x 52

33    (10 + 4)(10 + 5)           43    (10 + 2)(10 + 3)              53     71 x 71

34    (10 + 2)(10 + 1)           44    (10 + 3)(10 + 3)              54     99 x 99

35    (10 + 1)(10 + 1)           45    (10 + 4)(10 + 4)              55    1012 x 1012

36    (10  + 1)(10 + 3)          46    (100 + 3)(100 + 3)          56     29 x 31

37    (10  + 4)(10 + 3)          47    (100 - 3)(100 + 3)           57     18 x 22

38    (10  + 12)(10 + 3)         48     (100 + 5)(100 + 5)        58      28 x 32

39    (10  + 4)(10 + 9)           49    (50 + 3)(50 + 3)             59     109 x 991

40    (10  + 10)(10 + 10)       50    (30 + 2)(40 - 3)              60    1012 x 988

By now you should be seeing ways of doing arithmetic in lots of ways, so this next set offer a variety of methods. Make sure you show enough working to communicate the method you have picked. Calculators are completely unnecessary; you should have an idea at least of the last digit and the right size of answer.

61     61²                               71     907 x 907                            81     9⁴ =  81 x 81

62     161²                             72     907 x 913                            82      (10-3)(50-1)

63     104 x 96                      73     907 x 893                            83        7.1 ²

64     105 x 95                      74     93²                                       84        0.71²

65     35²                               75     907 x 1093                          85        0.071²

66     35 x 45                        76      24²                                      86          0.99²

67     36 x 34                         77     1024²                                 87         1.018 x 1.022

68     33 x 37                         78      976²                                 88         0.28 x 0.32

69     320 x 380                     79      79²                                     89          1.09 x 9.91

70     321 x 381                     80      179 x 21                            90           10.12 x 98.8

Email: David@Scoins.net      © David Scoins 2018